This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/04/2022 at 14:11:12 (UTC).

Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stern, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7661

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stern, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Janaina Pontes Silva Monteiro

Isabela Do Nascimento Fonseca Galvao

Rodrigo Ferreira

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen E. Ronk

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

633 W. 5Th Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tim A. Goetz

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2901 Airport Drive

Torrance, CA 90505

Candice S. Nam

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

633 W 5Th St Fl 52

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2086

Cathrine E. Tauscher

Attorney at Robinson Helicopter Company

2901 Airport Drive

Torrance, CA 90505

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Michael Stern

Attorney at Dept. 62

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Elizabeth L. Crooke

Attorney at Engstrom Lipscomb & Lack

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4107

Kathryn Maher Infante

1111 Alexandria Dr

San Diego, CA 92107

Walter John Lack

Attorney at Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4107

Michael Pendlebury Lewis

Attorney at Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack

10100 Santa Monica Blvd Fl 12

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4113

Steven C. Marks

Attorney at Podhurst Orseck Josefsburg Eaton

25 W. Flagler Street Suite 800

Miami, FL 33130-1780

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate filed on January 19, 2022, has been read and considered, along with the preliminary opposition and reply. The petition is denied because petitioner fails to demonstrate a prima facie case that the trial court abused its discretion. (Martinez v. Ford Motor Co. (2010) 185 Cal.App.4th 9, 18.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on January 19, 2022, has been read and considered, along with the preliminary opposition and reply. The petition is denied because petitioner fails to demonstrate a prima facie case that the trial court abused its discretion. (Martinez v. Ford Motor Co. (2010) 185 Cal.App.4th 9, 18.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of Service for Petitioner Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.'s Reply to Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.'s Reply to Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: RPIs Monteiro, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Elizabeth Crooke, counsel for RPI, re incorrect email address on file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate, filed by RPIs Monteiro, et al. via letter from Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack dated January 31, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Civil Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief (Stay Requested) Vol 5 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Civil Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief (Stay Requested) Vol 4 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Civil Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief (Stay Requested) Vol 3 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Civil Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief (Stay Requested) Vol 2 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Civil Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief (Stay Requested) Vol 1 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Civil Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief (Stay Requested)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROOKE ELIZABETH LANE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS MICHAEL PENDLEBURY