This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/07/2021 at 01:54:07 (UTC).

Robin Investment Group, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Robin Investment Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0261

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellant

Robin Investment Group, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Gregory Keosian

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Frank McHugh, Trustee of the Christine O'Donovan Trust "A" Dated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Scott J. Leipzig

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natasis LLP

1901 Ave Of The Stars Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Francis Norman Scollan

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

865 S. Figueroa St. Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Zachary D. Schorr

Attorney at Schorr Law, A Professional Corporation

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 615

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6051

Stephanie Ching-Yee Goldstein

Attorney at Schorr Law, APC

1901 Avenue Of The Stars - #615

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 11, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Lodging of Certified Trial Transcript from January 6, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Kevin Sweet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Robin Investment Group, Inc. Attorney: Scott J. Leipzig

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Jan 22, 2021 by Robin Investment Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Robin Investment Group, Inc.Attorney: Scott J. Leipzig

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of supersedeas, filed February 11, 2021, the separately filed request for a temporary stay, and respondent's oppositions. The petition is denied. The temporary stay issued by this court on February 8, 2021, is dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 responsive feeResponsive filing fee paid by Schorr Law, A Professional Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: respondent's opposition to petition for writ of supersedeas filed by RPI Frank McHugh Trustee of the Christine O'Donovan Trust "A" dated 8/19/86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: amended proof of service filed by petitioner re writ petition/appendix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: appendix in support of petition for writ of supersedeas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: filed by Robin Investment Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: amended proof of service (as to LASC) filed by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: The court is in receipt of a "Separately Filed Request for Temporary Stay of Enforcement of Eviction Under Unlawful Detainer Judgement [sic] Pending Petition for Writ of Supersedeas," electronically submitted at 6:32 p.m. on February 5, 2021. No corresponding supersedeas petition has been filed. An immediate stay of the eviction at issue is granted through Tuesday, February 16, 2021. Appellant shall have until 12:00 p.m. on February 11, 2021, to file a supporting supersedeas petition if it wishes to pursue such relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATELY FILED REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF EVICTION UNDER UNLAWFUL DETAINER JUDGMENT PENDING PETITION FOR WRIT OF SUPERSEDEAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Proposed Order for Temporary Stay of Enforcement of Eviction Under Unlawful Detainer Judgement, Pending Petition for Writ of Supersedeas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion; FOR EMERGENCY STAY. Separately Filed Request for Temporary Stay of Enforcement of Eviction Under Unlawful Detainer Judgement, Pending Petition for Writ of Supersedeas.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robin Investment Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Bennett