This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2023 at 10:01:32 (UTC).

Robertson v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Robertson filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Traber, Theresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0241

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Traber, Theresa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mike Allen Robertson

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Theresa M. Traber

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Roscat Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Domingo Reynaldo Tan

Attorney at Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP

10960 Wilshire Boulevard 18 Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3804

Sita Joanna Dyriam

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

10960 Wilshire Boulevard 18 Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3804

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Silver Lisa Kim

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

500 North Brand Blvd Ste 1650

Glendale, CA 91203-2921

Justin Arnold Bubion

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

500 North Brand Blvd. Ste 1650

Glendale, CA 91203

Debra Ann Stevens

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

500 North Brand Blvd Ste 1650

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed May 12, 2022, and the exhibits thereto, filed May 24, 2022, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed May 12, 2022, and the exhibits thereto, filed May 24, 2022, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: petition for writ of mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: counsel. No later than May 25, 2022, petitioner shall serve and file a record adequate for review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486), including but not limited to (a) all documents filed with the superior court in support of and in opposition to the motion for summary adjudication, and (b) all documents demonstrating the timeliness of the petition. Failure to complete the record is expected to result in summary denial of the petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less