This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/08/2022 at 04:07:25 (UTC).

Robbins v. JP Morgan Chase Bank

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Robbins filed an Other lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Bank. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ford III, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8697

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ford III, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Timothy Robbins

Defendant and Respondent

JP Morgan Chase Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Paul S. Levine

Attorney at Law Office Of Paul S. Levine

1054 Superba Avenue

Venice, CA 90291-3940

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Tod V. Beebe

Attorney at Barton, Klugman & Oetting, LLP

350 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3485

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Timothy Robbins Attorney: Paul S. Levine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Good cause appearing, appellant's motion filed May 2, 2022 to reinstate appeal is granted. The order of dismissal filed April 26, 2022, is vacated and the appeal filed February 4, 2022, is reinstated. Appellants' Civil Case Information Statement submitted concurrently with the motion to reinstate appeal is deemed filed the date of this order. In addition, the clerk of the superior court is to proceed with the preparation of the record on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Timothy RobbinsAttorney: Paul S. Levine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to reinstate appeal (Civil Case Information Statement received concurrently on 4/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed February 4, 2022, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on March 26, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (February 4, 2022 by Timothy Robbins ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Copy of order or judgment being appeal submitted for filing on March 16, 2022 has been rejected. Appellant must serve and file a complete civil case information statement (form APP-004), attaching a copy of the judgment or appealed order that shows the date it was entered. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.100(g), 8.25). The form can be obtained from this Court's website. https://www.courts.ca.gov/2133.htm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on March 16, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 4, 2022 by Timothy Robbins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20SMCV01020; Trial Court Judge: Ford III, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEEBE TOD VINCENT ESQ.