This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/05/2022 at 02:06:41 (UTC).

Riverside Community Hospital v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Riverside Community Hospital filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Berle, Elihu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1311

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Berle, Elihu

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Riverside Community Hospital

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Elihu M. Berle

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Mary Bravo

Jack Akmakjian

Gurvinder Singh Uppal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David P. Pruett

Attorney at Carroll Kelly Trotter & Franzen

111 West Ocean Boulevard, 14Th Floor Post Office Box 22636

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

Richard Douglas Carroll

Attorney at Carroll Kelly Trotter & Franzen

111 West Ocean Blvd. 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

Zuzana Svihra Ikels

Attorney at King & Spaulding, LLP

50 California Street, Suite 3300 Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Joseph Winters Cotchett, Jr.

Attorney at Cotchett & Pitre

840 Malcolm Road Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Robert B. Hutchinson

Attorney at COTCHETT, PITRE & McCARTHY, LLP

2716 Ocean Park Blvd., Suite 3025

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Carlos Urzua

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Theresa Vitale

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP

2716 Ocean Park Blvd., Suite 3088

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Andrew F. Kirtley

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Rd Ste 200

Burlingame, CA 94010-1413

Thomas Edward Fraysse

Attorney at Knox Ricksen LLP

777 S. Figueroa St., Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Maisie Clark Sokolove

Attorney at Knox Ricksen LLP

2033 N. Main Street, Suite 340

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Itak Moradi

Attorney at Knox Ricksen LLP

2033 N Main St Ste 340

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3727

Brian S. Kabateck

Attorney at Kabateck, LLP

633 W. Fifth Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Matthew Amir Sahak

Attorney at Kabateck LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Barret Thomas Alexander

Attorney at Kabateck LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Jorgen Kjar

Attorney at Kjar, McKenna and Stockalper LLP,

841 Apollo St. Ste 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

David J. Rubaum

Attorney at KJAR MCKENNA & STOCKAPLER LLP

841 Apollo Street, Suite 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Lewis Richard Walton, Jr

Attorney at Walton & Walton, LLP

4640 Admiralty Dr. 5Th Floor

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Dennis K. Ames

Attorney at La Follette, Johnson, DeHaas, Fesler & Ames

2677 N. Main Street Suite 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Brian Hill

Attorney at LA FOLLETT, JOHNSON, DE HAAS, FESLER & AMES

2677 North Main St., Suite 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on June 30, 2022. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on June 30, 2022. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Three Volumes of Exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Request for immediate Stay for Discovery for Trial on July 18, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAHAK MATTHEW AMIR