This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/03/2022 at 02:00:44 (UTC).

Rivers v. Academy of Art University et al.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Rivers filed an Other lawsuit against Academy of Art University. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5102

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ronald David Rivers

Oakland, CA 94601

Respondents and Defendants

Academy of Art University

Elisa Stephens

Reid Raukar

Marguerite Crooks

Michael J. Vartain

Sue Rowley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Joseph Vartain

Attorney at Vartain Law Group

601 Montgomery Street - Suite 780

San Francisco, CA 94111-2608

Stacey Lynn Leask

Attorney at Vartain Law Group

601 Montgomery St Ste 780

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: from aplt;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying rehearing petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: By appellant Rivers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Non-operative appeal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Ronald David Rivers purports to appeal from an order that was filed on January 13, 2022. The Civil Case Information Statement appellant has filed concedes notice of entry of the January 13, 2022, order was served on January 14, 2022. Therefore, under California Rules of Court, rule 8.104(a)(1)(A) and (a)(1)(B), appellant had 60 days from that date, i.e., March 15, 2022, to file his notice of appeal. Appellant?s notice, filed on April 4, 2022, was too late. Dismissal is mandatory. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104(b).) The appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ronald David Rivers Pro Per amended; (no bankruptcy);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ronald David RiversPro Per; Notes: amended; (no bankruptcy);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Mr. Rivers, Following the court's instruction, I write once again regarding your Civil Case Information Statement. On page 1, question 3, you have indicated a bankruptcy, but you have failed to "attach a copy of the bankruptcy petition & and any stay order." If you wish to proceed with your appeal, you need to fix this issue no later than Wednesday, May 31, 2022. If you fail fully and timely comply, your appeal may be dismissed for your failure to comply with the Rules of Court. Thank you. Channing (Mr.) Channing Hoo Deputy Clerk, Division 4 California Court of Appeal, 1st District 415.865.7296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ronald David Rivers Pro Per (order attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Mr. Rivers, Without addressing the contents of your opening brief or the merits of your appeal, the court has directed me to return your Opening Brief as being premature, meaning too early. After the Superior Court files the record on appeal that you designated, the appellate court will send you an email telling you when the opening brief is due. Only at that later time will you file your Opening Brief. Thank you. Channing (Mr.) Channing Hoo Deputy Clerk, Division 4 California Court of Appeal, 1st District 415.865.7296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Mr. Rivers, The court has directed me to return your Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal for filing with the Superior Court, which is where the record will be prepared. Thank you. Channing (Mr.) Channing Hoo Deputy Clerk, Division 4 California Court of Appeal, 1st District 415.865.7296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Mr. Rivers, The court has directed me to return your Civil Case Information Statement for completion: 1) on Page 1, question 3, which ask about a bankruptcy: Your answer is "yes," but you did not include a copy of the petition and any stay order as instructed; and 2) on Page 3, all the boxes are blank. You need to include yourself and the opposing party(ies). Please complete and resubmit. Thank you. Channing (Mr.) Channing Hoo Deputy Clerk, Division 4 California Court of Appeal, 1st District 415.865.7296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Request to Waive Court Fees; treated as a duplicate;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 04/04/2022 by Plaintiff Ronald D. Rivers in propria persona appealing judgment from 01/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC21592393; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACADEMY OF ART COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARTAIN, MICHAEL J.