This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/21/2023 at 11:43:41 (UTC).

Rivera v. Enterprise Truck Rental, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Rivera filed an Other lawsuit against Enterprise Truck Rental, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3690

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ismael Rivera

Respondent and Defendant

Enterprise Truck Rental, Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed September 29, 2022, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on September 29, 2022 by Ismael Rivera.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less