This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/09/2021 at 06:03:30 (UTC).

Ritchie etc., et al. v. Vibra Hospital of Sacramento, LLC.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Ritchie etc filed an Other lawsuit against Vibra Hospital of Sacramento, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Krueger, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3980

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Krueger, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Kyra Ritchie etc., et al.

Appellant and Defendant

Vibra Hospital of Sacramento, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Khaldoun Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup Melodia Kelly et al

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Tiffany J. Gates

Attorney at Law Offices of Tiffany J. Gates

3940 Broad Street, Suite 7

San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

Joseph Andrew Nicholson

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108-2607

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Eugene Ashley

Attorney at Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

60 South Market Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Alexander Hector Ramon

Attorney at Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

60 South Market Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Dennis Scott Zell

Attorney at Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

60 South Market Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Emma Berit Lloyd

Attorney at Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

55 South Market Street, Suite 900

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Respondent's counsel Kyra Ritchie. From: 3060 El Cerrito Plaza #301, El Cerrito, CA 94530 To: 3940 Broad Street, Suite 7, San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered to mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: HOGE, FENTON, JONES & APPEL, INC. 55 South Market Street, Suite 900 San Jose, CA 95113-2324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: respondents, adding attorney Tiffany J. Gates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: The Civil Case Information Statement has been rejected. The order or judgment being appealed has not been attached as required. Correct and re-submit by 5/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's mediation statement due: 5/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Appellant Vibra Hospital of Sacramento request to add additional attorneys from the same firm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant. Receipt #R324880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Filing fee or application due: 05/13/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement and Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 05/13/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended notice of filing notice of appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 04/05/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34202000287556CUBTGDS; Trial Court Judge: Krueger, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vibra Hospital of Sacramento, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Hector Ramon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emma Berit Lloyd