Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/05/2021 at 13:20:52 (UTC).

Risdana et al. v. Farrell

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Risdana filed an Other lawsuit against Farrell. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9564

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lewis, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Abdolhamid Risdana

Henry Risdana

Defendant and Respondent

Michael Patrick Farrell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey M. Howard

Attorney at Law Offices of Jeffrey M. Howard

48701 Shady View Dr.

Palm Desert, CA 92260

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Kenneth C. Feldman

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W 5Th Street Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Ponied 2 volumes of the RT certified copies (4 pages) attention to Adriana Araneta, court reporter supervisor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR/ K. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 11/05/2020. Appellant elects to proceed by rule 8.122 CT & RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's CCIS was rejected it had the incorrect entry of judgment of 08/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's CCSI was rejected; missing judgment/minute order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts' Abdolhamid Risdana and Henry Risdana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01108123; Trial Court Judge: Lewis, Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN KENNETH CHARLES