This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/28/2022 at 21:35:07 (UTC).

RINCON BAND OF LUISENO MISSION INDIANS OF THE RINCON RESERVATION CALIFORNIA v. FLYNT

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 RINCON BAND OF LUISENO MISSION INDIANS OF THE RINCON RESERVATION CALIFORNIA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against FLYNT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2136

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Rincon Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of The Rincon Reservation California

Tracey Barquist

Chumash California Gas Station No. 1 & 3, LLC

Chumash Cellars

Chumash California Hotel No. 1, LLC

Chumash Casino and Resort Enterprise

Chumash Vinyards, LLC

First Nations Economic Development Corporation

Harras Resort Southern California

Alfonso Kolb

Barbara Kolb

Kris Kolb

Lawrence Kolb

Teresa Kolb

Bo Mazetti

Rincon Economic Development Corporation

SYBCI California Hotel No. 2, LLC

Santo Ynez Band of Chumash Mission Indians of The Santa Ynez Reservation California

Steve Sherill

Steve Stallings

74 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard I. Wideman

485 Alisal Road

Solvang, CA 93463

Todd Stephen Kartchner

Attorney at Fennemore Craig, P.C.

2394 East Camelback Road, Suite 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Other Attorneys

Jonathan William Brown

Attorney at Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

42 Delaware Avenue.,Suite 120

Buffalo, NY 14202

Mark Ernest Ferrario

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

10845 Griffith Peak Drive Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135-1557

Stephen L. Schreiner

Attorney at Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Kathryn E. Karcher

Attorney at Karcher Harmes PS

401 B Street, Suite 2450

San Diego, CA 92101

Maurice Min-Ho Suh

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Martin Nebrida Buchanan

655 West Broadway, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

David J. Noonan

Attorney at Noonan Lance Boyer & Banach LLP

701 Island Avenue, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92101

Michael Anthony Attanasio

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

Blake M Zollar

2210 Encinitas Boulevard, Suite S

Encinitas, CA 92024-4376

Patricia P. Hollenbeck

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

750 B Street, Suite 2900

San Diego, CA 92101

Danielle Marie Guard

Attorney at J. Blonien, APLC

1121 L Street, Suite 150

Sacramento, CA 95814-3970

Erika Leana Mansky

Attorney at Mark S. Hoffman, A Professional Corp.

11845 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Mark Stuart Hoffman

Attorney at Law Office of Mark Hoffman, APC

11845 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Martin N. Buchanan

Attorney at Law Offices of Martin N. Buchanan, APC

170 Laurel Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Maureen Ann Harrington

Attorney at Greenfield Draa & Harrington

55 South Market Street, Suite 1500

San Jose, CA 95113

Michael R. White

Attorney at White & Reed, LLP

5757 West Century Boulevard, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Stephen Schreiner

Attorney at Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith, LLP

401 B Street Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Michael A. Attanasio

Attorney at Cooley LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Liu, J., is of the opinion the petition should be granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including March 4, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Blackstone Gaming, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: PT Gaming, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Knighted Ventures, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Majesty Partners, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Pacific United Service, Inc. Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Metis TPS, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Joinder to answer filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Blackstone Gaming, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: PT Gaming, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Knighted Ventures, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Majesty Partners, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Pacific United Service, Inc. Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher Defendant and Respondent: Metis TPS, LLC Attorney: Kathryn E. Karcher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Casino, LLC Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: El Dorado Enterprises, Inc. Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: California Commerce Club Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Celebrity Casinos, Inc. Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Hollywood Park Casino Company Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Oceans 11 Casino, LLC Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Sahara Dunes Casino, LP Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Bicycle Casino, LP Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Hawaiian Gardens Casino Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan Defendant and Respondent: Stones South Bay Corp. Attorney: Martin N. Buchanan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rincon Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of The Rincon Reservation California Attorney: Todd Stephen Kartchner Plaintiff and Appellant: Tracey Barquist Attorney: Todd Stephen Kartchner ** ET AL. **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D077571; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2018-00058170-CU-NP-CTL

    Read MoreRead Less