This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/04/2023 at 00:03:57 (UTC).

Richelieu-Boren v. Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Richelieu-Boren filed an Other lawsuit against Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosenberg, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5831

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosenberg, David

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Lianne Richelieu-Boren

Defendant and Respondent

Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P. Biegler

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

H. Thomas Watson

Kelli M. Kennaday

Karen M. Bray

Allison Marlene Nye

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's notice designating the record received on 2/3/2023 has been rejected. The notice designating the record on appeal is to be served and filed in the superior court pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.121.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Notification following an unresolved mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Mediation termination ordered.; Notes: Unresolved; RENNER, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent adding new attorneys H. Thomas Watson and Karen M. Bray of Horvitz & Levy LLP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered to mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's civil case information statement submitted on 4/6/2022 is rejected. The judgment or order being appealed from is not attached to the CCIS. Appellant's civil case information statement is to be corrected, re-served, filed by April 20, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement due: April 20, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: April 4, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Civil Mediation Statement due: 3/25/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's filing fee for notice of appeal filed on 3/03/22. Receipt number R325362.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 3/3/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: CV20200169; Trial Court Judge: Rosenberg, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less