Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 06/13/2021 at 02:07:09 (UTC).

Richard Villasenor v. P.T.C.H., Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Richard Villasenor filed an Other lawsuit against P T C H , Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Greene, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6598

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Greene, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Richard Villasenor

Defendants and Respondents

Palm Terrace Care Center

P.T.C.H., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Tara Danita Heckard-Bryant

Attorney at McElfish Law Firm

1112 North Sherbourne Drive

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Raymond David McElfish

Attorney at McElfish Law Firm

1112 North Sherbourne Drive

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Scott Anthony Blakeley

Attorney at LaFollette, Johnson, DeHaas, Fesler & Ames

865 S Figueroa St 32Nd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jason James Scupine

Attorney at LaFollette, Johnson, DeHaas, Fesler & Ames

865 S Figueroa St Fl 32

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David J. Ozeran

Attorney at LaFollette, Johnson, De Haas, Fesler & Ames

865 South Figueroa Street, 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5431

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard Villasenor Attorney: Raymond David McElfish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/01/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: P.T.C.H., Inc.Attorney: David J. Ozeran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Richard VillasenorAttorney: Raymond David McElfish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-5, R-1 (1158 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Appellant's counsel (second e-mail) RE: SCIF due 04/07/21 and extension was given to today.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Appellant's counsel RE: SCIF due 04/09/21. Attached copy of Notice and SCIF for completion and return by 09/09/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Mar 22, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Info Statement; missing copy of order/judgment being appealed from

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Feb 24, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Feb 18, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Feb 10, 2021; Richard Villasenor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1715739; Trial Court Judge: Greene, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P.T.C.H., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HECKARDBRYANT TARA DANITA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCELFISH RAYMOND D.