This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/22/2022 at 05:09:59 (UTC).

Rice v. Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Rice filed an Other lawsuit against Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Vicencia, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6079

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Vicencia, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Robert Rice

Defendant and Appellant

Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation

Other

Bus. & Prof. Code, 17209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Shane Dennis Howarter

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery St Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94111-5511

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery St Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94111-5511

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Scott A. Edelman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

2029 Century Park East Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3026

Monica B. Paladini

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Dr

Irvine, CA 92612

Jesse A Cripps, Jr

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Other Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

210 W. Temple Street 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Ave., Ste. 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Beginning in October 2022, counsel are unavailable to appear for oral argument on the following dates due to court appearances, including trials, and obligations related to other matters, including prescheduled personal time off: " October 3-14, 24-28, 2022 " November 7-18, 2022 " December 12, 2022 " January 3-5, 16-20, 25-26, 2023 " February 22-23, 2023 " March 6-10, 2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice sent to parties re: case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation Attorney: Jesse A Cripps, Jr Attorney: Monica B. Paladini Attorney: Scott A. Edelman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Gulfstream Aerospace CorporationAttorney: Jesse A Cripps, Jr Attorney: Monica B. Paladini Attorney: Scott A. Edelman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Amended Proof of Service for Respondent's Brief: Service on the Los Angeles Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Re: Respondent's Brief 1) Lack of service on Los Angeles Superior Court 2) Certificate of Interested Entities and Persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Re: Respondent's Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Robert Rice Attorney: Shane Dennis Howarter Attorney: Yosef Peretz

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation Attorney: Jesse A Cripps, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Gulfstream Aerospace CorporationAttorney: Jesse A Cripps, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (432 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation Attorney: Jesse A Cripps, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Gulfstream Aerospace CorporationAttorney: Jesse A Cripps, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 397605 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Oct. 28, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Oct. 15, 2021: Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21LBCV00176; Trial Court Judge: Vicencia, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFSTREAM AEROSPACE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Bus. & Prof. Code sec. 17209 Unfair Competition Act is a litigant