This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/29/2023 at 03:08:47 (UTC).

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP v. Downs

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen Shapiro LLP filed an Other lawsuit against Downs. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kin, Curtis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4408

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kin, Curtis

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

Appellant and Defendant

Gary P Downs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Michael L. Cypers

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/07/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Elizabeth Chilton is associated as counsel for respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks (458 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 1, 2022: 8.122 no RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: filed by appellant Gary Downs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Gary P Downs Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 06/07/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Gary P DownsPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Gary P DownsPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant ( October 28, 2022 by Gary P. Downs. (U6) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee paid via credit card (U6).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.(U6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 28, 2022 by Gary P. Downs. (U6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC506921; Trial Court Judge: Kin, Curtis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less