***7780
09/03/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Other
Statewide, California
Byrdsong, Rupert
William Rice
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
Gary P. Downs
William Rice
Michelle Joanna Correll
Michael L. Cypers
Elizabeth G. Chilton
Harlan Burnett Watkins
Jens Benjamin Koepke
Steven Dominic Martini
Gary Philip Downs
Michelle Joanna Correll
Court documents are not available for this case.
HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed Sep 9, 2020: 8.124 w.RT
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Service list update received from:; Notes: Appellant Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP, dtd Oct. 6, 2020, re: additional respondent's lawyers
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Service list update received from:; Notes: Appellant Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Request sent for service list of active parties/attys.; Notes: To Michael Cypers, counsel for appellant.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP Attorney: Michael L. Cypers
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 04/05/2021; Party Attorney: Appellant: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLPAttorney: Elizabeth G. Chilton Attorney: Michael L. Cypers
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLPAttorney: Michael L. Cypers
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 3, 2020 by Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (U4)
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC506921; Trial Court Judge: Byrdsong, Rupert
[-] Read Less