This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/07/2021 at 00:08:03 (UTC).

Rice v. Downs

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Rice filed an Other lawsuit against Downs. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Byrdsong, Rupert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7780

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Byrdsong, Rupert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

William Rice

Appellant

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

Defendants and Respondents

Gary P. Downs

William Rice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle Joanna Correll

Appellant Attorneys

Michael L. Cypers

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Harlan Burnett Watkins

Jens Benjamin Koepke

Steven Dominic Martini

Gary Philip Downs

Michelle Joanna Correll

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed Sep 9, 2020: 8.124 w.RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service list update received from:; Notes: Appellant Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP, dtd Oct. 6, 2020, re: additional respondent's lawyers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service list update received from:; Notes: Appellant Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request sent for service list of active parties/attys.; Notes: To Michael Cypers, counsel for appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP Attorney: Michael L. Cypers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 04/05/2021; Party Attorney: Appellant: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLPAttorney: Elizabeth G. Chilton Attorney: Michael L. Cypers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLPAttorney: Michael L. Cypers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 3, 2020 by Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (U4)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC506921; Trial Court Judge: Byrdsong, Rupert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less