This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/23/2021 at 21:21:27 (UTC).

Rezzadeh v. PARS-15, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Rezzadeh filed an Other lawsuit against PARS-15, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3239

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lampe, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Rudy Rezzadeh

Defendants and Respondents

PARS-15, LLC

John C. Chiu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Lee David Lubin

Attorney at Law Office of Lee David Lubin, Inc.

16133 Ventura Blvd Ste 1175

Encino, CA 91436-2416

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Karl Patrick Schlecht

Attorney at Tressler LLP

2 Park Plz Ste 1050

Irvine, CA 92614-8521

Judy Ying Chiang

Attorney at Tressler LLP

2 Park Plaza, Suite 1050

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Receipt for Record and Certificate of Mailing Register of Actions dated 10/7/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Atty Lubin ofo Applt Rezzadeh filed 10/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 9/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Lubin obo Applt Rezzadeh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement submitted by Atty Lubin through TrueFiling; no copy of judgment or order being appealed from attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Atty Lubin obo Applt Rezzadeh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All counsel and superior court re: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation; suspension of the preparation of the record on appeal... is terminated as of this date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Schlecht obo Respondent PARS-15,LLC et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Lubin obo Applt Rezzadeh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Atty Lubin obo Applt Rezzadeh in the amount of $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Atty Lubin obo Applt Rezzadeh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Lubin obo Applt Rudy Rezadeh appeals from the 7/30/21 Order of Dismissal ad Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-103102; Trial Court Judge: Lampe, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARS-15, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIANG JUDY Y.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHLECHT KARL P.