This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/16/2022 at 22:29:54 (UTC).

REMEDIAL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES v. AECOM

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 REMEDIAL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AECOM. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0066

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Remedial Construction Services, LP

Appellants and Defendants

Aecom, Inc.

Aecom Technical Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Andrew Culp Spitser

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1683

Stephen E. Foster

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew S. Beasley Cockroft

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Andrew C. Spitser

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1683

Tiffany A. Harrod

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Koft & Karr, P.C.

700 Milam Street Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002-2806

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Alana H. Rotter

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Ivana Cingel

Attorney at AECOM

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Floor 26

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6033

Marion Teresa Hack

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Luke Nicholas Eaton

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP.

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3427

Cynthia E. Tobisman

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3697

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Remedial Construction Services, LP, Plaintiff and Respondent Andrew C. Spitser, Retained counsel** Filed with permission **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Aecom, Inc. Attorney: Alana H. Rotter Defendant and Appellant: Aecom Technical Services, Inc. Attorney: Alana H. Rotter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Aecom, Inc. Attorney: Alana H. Rotter Defendant and Appellant: Aecom Technical Services, Inc. Attorney: Alana H. Rotter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Remedial Construction Services, LP Attorney: Andrew C. Spitser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Aecom, Inc. Attorney: Alana H. Rotter Defendant and Appellant: Aecom Technical Services, Inc. Attorney: Alana H. Rotter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303797; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Barbara County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 19CV04505

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Remedial Construction Services, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where EARTH TECH (DE), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alana H. Rotter