This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/29/2022 at 19:00:49 (UTC).

REHABBERS FINANCIAL v. CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 REHABBERS FINANCIAL filed an Other lawsuit against CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2068

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Rehabbers Financial, Inc.

Defendant and Respondent

Chicago Title Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce Barclay Paller

Attorney at Attorney at Law

3639 East Harbor Boulevard, #112

Ventura, CA 93001

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Janice Maureen Kroll

Attorney at Hennelly & Grossfeld LLP

Marina Towers North 4640 Admiralty Way, Suite 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Michael George King

Attorney at Hennelly & Grossfeld LLP

4640 Admiralty Way, Suite 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Susan J. Williams

Attorney at Hennelly & Grossfeld LLP

4640 Admiralty Way, Suite 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Chicago Title Insurance Company Attorney: Susan J. Williams Court of Appeal has considered the request for publication and is denied for the reason that the court does not find said opinion meets the standard for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105 of the California Rules of Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F081045; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Kern County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CV-271706

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING MICHAEL GEORGE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KROLL JANICE MAUREEN