This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/03/2021 at 21:24:45 (UTC).

REES v. AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 REES filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0962

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Shawn Rees

Paso Robles, CA 93446

Defendants and Respondents

American Security Insurance Company

White Woodman

Kathleen Conway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jeffrey N. Williams

Attorney at Wargo & French LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 4625

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Scott R. Laes

Attorney at Wargo & French LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 4625

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Raymond Joseph Tittmann

Attorney at Wargo & French LLP

610 South Figueroa Street Suite 4625

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark L. Block

Attorney at Wargo & French LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 4625

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: American Security Insurance Company Attorney: Jeffrey N. Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (vol. 1 of 1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Shawn Rees Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: Having received the petition for review within the Court's original jurisdiction, the time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including November 18, 2021. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received untimely petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Shawn Rees Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302938; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); Trial Court Case Number: 18CVP0352

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS JEFFREY N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tittmann, Raymond J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAES SCOTT R. ESQ