This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/19/2021 at 02:44:55 (UTC).

Redstone et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 Redstone filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hess, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8954

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hess, Robert

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Shari Redstone

Tyler Korff

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Others

Jeremy Jagiello

Giovanni Paz

Interested Party

Manuela Herzer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert Nathan Klieger

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West Sixth Street Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Andrew Kiley Walsh

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West Sixth Street Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Vivian Lee Thoreen

Attorney at Holland & Knight

400 S. Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Robert Leslie Hess

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 24

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Other Attorneys

Bonita Dombey Moore

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels

11766 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Matthew Edward Hess

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Interested Party Attorneys

Nithin Kumar

Attorney at Bird Marella

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ronald Neil Richards

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald Richards & Associates, A.P.C.

P.O. Box 11480

Beverly Hills, CA 90213

Thomas V. Reichert

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561

 

Court Documents

B288954

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied. Corrigan, J ., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request) Petitioner: Shari Redstone Attorney: Robert N. Klieger Petitioner: Tyler Korff Attorney: Vivian Lee Thoreen [Per Supreme Court website.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Memorandum to Supreme Court with recommendation to deny request for publication.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: by Real Party in Interest, Manuela Herzer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied on merits by opinion; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Kin, Curtis A.; Participants: Moor, Carl H. (Concur) Baker, Lamar W. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) We deny the petition for writ of mandate and affirm the trial court's order denying petitioners' motions to disqualify Bird Marella. Kin*-Baker-Moor. 16 pages. *Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: Request for copy of oral argument audio recording by Ronald Richards, received.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed March 23, 2018, the preliminary opposition filed April 2, 2012, and the reply to the preliminary opposition filed April 12, 2018. You are ordered to show cause before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90013, on July 11, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., why the relief prayed for in the petition for writ of mandate should not be granted. The return to the order to show cause, if any, shall be filed on or before May 17, 2018. A reply, if any, shall be filed on or before June 7, 2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply to preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive Filing Fee RPI, Manuela Herzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Manuela Herzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Preliminary opposition to petiton for writ of mandate by real party in interest Manuela Herzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: for real party in interest Manuela Herzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 3 of 3 of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 2 of 3 Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 3 Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate / Prohibition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIEGER ROBERT N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOREEN VIVIAN LEE ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH ANDREW KILEY