Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/06/2021 at 00:33:20 (UTC).

Reddish et al. v. Westamerica Bank

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Reddish filed an Other lawsuit against Westamerica Bank. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seligman, Brad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1079

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    First Appellate District - Division 1

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Seligman, Brad

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Susan V. Diaz

Brittany Michaels

Alfonso Madueno

Anne Reddish

Adriana Gutierrez

Defendant and Appellant

Westamerica Bank

Not Yet Classified

Office of the Attorney General

Appellate Coordinator, Consumer Law Section 300 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Edwin Aiwazian

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice P.C.

410 West Arden Ave., Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Joanna Ghosh

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice

410 West Arden Ave, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203-4007

Carolyn Cottrell

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite. 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

David C. Leimbach

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Brett David Watson

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP

2000 Powell St Ste 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608-1863

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Lynn R. Fiorentino

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

55 Second Street, 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Paul Robert Lynd

Attorney at Arent Fox, LLP

55 Second Street 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 03/29/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 03/29/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 3, Exhs. 18-39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 2, Exhs. 11-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 1, Exhs. 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Westamerica Bank Attorney: Lynn R. Fiorentino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 03/29/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Anne ReddishAttorney: Joanna Ghosh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Westamerica BankAttorney: Lynn R. Fiorentino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Appellant's counsel regarding AOB and Appendix

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Westamerica Bank Attorney: Paul Robert Lynd Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: (Appellant.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Westamerica BankAttorney: Paul Robert Lynd; Notes: Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid by credit card

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-4(attached to designation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/17/2020. Designating 8.124 with RT(4 vols attached).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/03/2020 by Counsel for Defendant Westamerica Bank appealing order from 06/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP004921; Trial Court Judge: Seligman, Brad

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTAMERICA BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Office of the Attorney General is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leimbach, David C