This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/21/2023 at 06:02:38 (UTC).

Rechnitz et al. v. Glaser et al.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Rechnitz filed an Other lawsuit against Glaser. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tamzarian, Armen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1624

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Tamzarian, Armen

 

Party Details

Appellants and Petitioners

Brius LLC

Brius Management Co

Shlomo Rechnitz

Respondents

Patricia Glaser

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Roy Williams

Alexis Paschedag Federico

Respondent Attorneys

Claudia L. Stone

Matthew Pierce Bernstein

Joel N. Klevens

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Jonathan B. Cole

 

Court Documents

B321624

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondents may recover their costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final Respondents may recover their costs on appeal.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Edmon, Lee Smalley; Participants: Lavin, Luis A. (Concur) Heidel, Sarah J. (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) Respondents may recover their costs on appeal.Edmon, P.J. / Lavin, J. / Heidel, J.* ____________ * Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: 2:17:32--2:42:05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: FW: DIVISION 3 MAY 9, 2023 ORAL ARGUMENT - ATTORNEY LINK (AFTERNOON CALENDAR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Michael Williams for appellants Brius LLC et al.--20 min

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Joel N. Klevens, Retained counsel for respondent (20 min)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: May 9, 2023 at 01:30 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Brius LLC Attorney: Alexis Paschedag Federico Petitioner and Appellant: Brius Management Co Attorney: Alexis Paschedag Federico Petitioner and Appellant: Shlomo Rechnitz Attorney: Alexis Paschedag Federico Two extensions granted for a total of 44 days: 01/11/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 03/01/2023 By 30 Day(s) 02/23/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 03/15/2023 By 14 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
09/27/2022

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's application for extension of time to file opposition to Respondent's motion to dismiss appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (after record).; Notes: Respondent's motion to dismiss appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 17, 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #59365 for $775

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Brius LLC Attorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Brius Management Co Attorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Shlomo Rechnitz Attorney: Michael Roy Williams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Brius LLCAttorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Brius Management CoAttorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Shlomo RechnitzAttorney: Michael Roy Williams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/9/2022 by Brius, LLC, et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCP00244; Trial Court Judge: Tamzarian, Armen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less