This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/25/2023 at 02:15:57 (UTC).

Rechnitz et al. v. Glaser et al.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Rechnitz filed an Other lawsuit against Glaser. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tamzarian, Armen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1624

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Tamzarian, Armen

 

Party Details

Appellants and Petitioners

Brius LLC

Brius Management Co

Shlomo Rechnitz

Respondents

Patricia Glaser

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Roy Williams

Attorney at Bienert Katzman Littrell Williams LLP

903 Calle Amanecer Suite 350

San Clemente, CA 92673

Alexis Paschedag Federico

Attorney at Bienert Katzman Littrell Williams LLP

903 Calle Amanecer, Ste 350

San Clemente, CA 92673-6253

Respondent Attorneys

Joel N. Klevens

Attorney at Glazer, Weil, Fink, Jacobs & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, 19Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jonathan B. Cole

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole, APC

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

Claudia L. Stone

Attorney at Nemeck & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436-2300

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd. 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew Pierce Bernstein

Attorney at Glaser Weil

10250 Constellation Blvd., Fl 19

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: [NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS][Appellant's opening brief and appendix]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Brius LLC. et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: Respondents' motion to dismiss the appeal (filed September 14, 2022) is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Appellants' notice of errata regarding declaration of Michael R. Williams in support of Appellant's opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of Michael R. Williams in support of appellants' opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Appellant's opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss appealOne extension granted for a total of 15 days: 09/27/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/14/2022 By 15 Day(s) 10/03/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/14/2022 By 15 Day(s) Opposition to Respondent's motion to dismiss appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Due on 11/16/2022 By 30 Day(s) Application for extension of time to file Appellant's opening brief and appendix is granted to November 16, 2022. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Edmon, P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Respondent's opposition to Appellant's application for additional time to respond to file their opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Having considered Appellants' Application for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (the "Application"), and the Declaration of Michael R. Williams filed in support thereof, and for good cause having been shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Application is GRANTED. 2. The Appellants' Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal shall be filed on or before October 14, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. Edmon, P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Requested for 12/16/2022 By 60 Day(s) Application for extension of time to file Appellant's opening brief and appendix.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (after record).; Notes: Respondent's motion to dismiss appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 17, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #59365 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Brius LLC Attorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Brius Management Co Attorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Shlomo Rechnitz Attorney: Michael Roy Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Due Date: 12/08/2022; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Brius LLCAttorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Brius Management Co Petitioner and Appellant: Shlomo Rechnitz; Notes: [NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS][Appellant's opening brief and appendix]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Brius LLCAttorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Brius Management CoAttorney: Michael Roy Williams Petitioner and Appellant: Shlomo RechnitzAttorney: Michael Roy Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/9/2022 by Brius, LLC, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCP00244; Trial Court Judge: Tamzarian, Armen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less