This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/26/2022 at 15:25:06 (UTC).

Reach Air Medical Services, LLC et al. v. Workers' Compensation Appeals Board et al.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Reach Air Medical Services, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Workers' Compensation Appeals Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5051

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

Reach Air Medical Services, LLC et al.

Michael Morarity

Respondents

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

San Francisco, CA 94142

Adan Lomeli

Grimmer Farms

Arbuckle, CA 95912

Zenith Insurance Company

Steven Oldaker

County of Los Angeles

Attn: Workers Compensation Department 500 W Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Tristar Risk Management

Cedars Sinai Medical Center

P.O. Box 200

Whittier, CA 90608

David Cowman

York Risk Services Group

Humbolt Radiology Medical Group, Inc.

P.O. Box 6428

Eureka, CA 95502

Sedgwick Pasadena

Pasadena, CA 91109

Michael Morarity

City of Vallejo

Attn: Workers Compensation Department 555 Santa Clara Street

Vallejo, CA 94590

CSB Sutter Medical Center

9 Commercial Blvd., Suite 201

Novato, CA 94949

Noel Provost

City of Hollister

Attn: Workers Compensation Department 375 5Th Street

Hollister, CA 95023

Acclamation Insurance Management Services

P.O. Box 269120

Sacramento, CA 95826

Gilbert Silva

142 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Charlotte H. Taylor

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Joshua L. Fuchs

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Kathryn Doi

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Josephine Kendra Petrick

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Respondent Attorneys

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

Attorney at Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

P.O. Box 429459

San Francisco, CA 94142

Allison J. Fairchild

Attorney at Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

P.O. Box 429459

San Francisco, CA 94142

Richard G. Revel

Attorney at Chernow and Lieb

P.O. Box 9055

Van Nuys, CA 91409

Matthew Baumgartner

Attorney at Armbrust & Brown, PLLC

100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Gold D. Lee

Attorney at Lewis, Marenstein, Wicke, Sherwin & Lee

20750 Ventura Blvd., Suite 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6251

Gold D Lee

Attorney at Lewis, Marenstein, Wicke, Sherwin & Lee

20750 Ventura Blvd., Suite 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6251

John A. Bloom

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2101 Fourth Street

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

Boone Thomas White

Attorney at MacIntyre & White, LLP

200 Washington Street, Suite 101

Santa Cruz, CA 95060-4976

Other Attorneys

Gregory P. Fletcher

Attorney at Bradford & Barthel LLP

2518 River Plaza Drive

Sacramento, CA 95833

Alcides O. Cabrera

Attorney at Stockwell, Harris, Woolverton, & Helphrey

1545 River Park Drive, Suite 330

Sacramento, CA 95815

Abel Calderon, Jr

Attorney at MacDonald, Ebbing, & Lloyd, LLP

999 Corporate Drive, Suite 1000

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694

Rodolfo Giovanni Florian

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

2275 Gateway Oaks Dr #220

Sacramento, CA 95833

Alan R. Canfield

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

5880 Owens Drive, Third Floor

Pleasanton, CA 94588-3900

Ohnmar M. Shin

Attorney at Mullen & Filippi LLP

1435 River Park Drive # 300

Sacramento, CA 95815

Kariann Junio

Attorney at D'Andre Law, LLP

6042 N Fresno Street, Suite 205

Fresno, CA 93710-5279

Timothy Michael Camacho

Attorney at Gleason & Camacho

727 18Th Street

Modesto, CA 95354

43 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Narco Injection Molding, Inc's copies of the 12/3/21 pro hac vice order and 12/3/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The Workers' Compensation Appeals Board has acted within its jurisdiction to reconsider the issue presented in the petition for writ of review. (See Shipley v. Workers' Comp. Appeals Bd. (1992) 7 Cal.App.4th 1104, 1107.) Accordingly, the petition for writ of review is denied as moot. Raye, P.J., Blease, J., Renner, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondent Zenith Insurance Company's request for an extension of time submitted on 1/7/22. Rejected as unnecessary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The Workers' Compensation Appeals Board has acted within its jurisdiction to reconsider the issue presented in the petition for writ of review. (See Shipley v. Workers' Comp. Appeals Bd. (1992) 7 Cal.App.4th 1104, 1107.) Accordingly, the petition for writ of review is denied as moot. Raye, P.J., Blease, J., Renner, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Destefano Design Group Inc., copies of the 12/3/21 pro hac vice order and 12/3/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Safway Service, LLC's copies of the 12/3/21 pro hac vice order and 12/3/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Destefano Design Group Inc., copies of the 11/12/21 pro hac vice order and 11/12/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Heritage Farms copies of the 12/3/21 pro hac vice order and 12/3/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Clearpoint Resources copies of the 12/3/21 pro hac vice order and 12/3/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Received Cedars Sinai Medical Center's copies of the 11/12/21 pro hac vice order and 11/12/21 letter. Envelope marked "Return to sender". Unable to locate an updated address. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioners requesting a supplemental letter brief due by November 22, 2021. The time within which to file an answer to the petition by all remaining respondents is extended until December 22, 2021.*Corrected letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: See corrected letter sent 11/12/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The requests of Joshua L. Fuchs and Charlotte H. Taylor to appear as counsel pro hac vice for petitioners are granted. RAYE, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: respondent Workers' Compensation Appeals Board.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: By Charlotte H. Taylor to appear as counsel on behalf of petitioners. Trial court association of counsel established.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: By Joshua L. Fuchs to appear as counsel on behalf of petitioners. Trial court association of counsel established.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by petitioners.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: petition for writ of review. 1 vol. (215 pgs.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of review filed (WCAB).; Notes: Review of federal preemption.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Hollister is a litigant

Latest cases where Acclamation Insurance Management Services Long Term Disability Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where REACH AIR MEDICAL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Vallejo is a litigant