This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/29/2023 at 11:00:45 (UTC).

RATCLIFF v. THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 RATCLIFF filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5277

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Charles Ratcliff, Jr.

John CM Doe

John CB Doe

John RC Doe

Defendants and Appellants

The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles

St. Christopher Catholic Church

St. Mary Catholic Church

St. Lawrence Martyr Catholic Church

Archdiocese of Los Angeles Education & Welfare Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Holly Noelle Boyer

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Shea Sierra Murphy

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Anthony M. DeMarco

Attorney at Law Offices of Anthony DeMarco

650 Sierra Madre Villa Avenue, Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91107

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

James Michael Hennigan

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Elizabeth Susan Lachman

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan PC

300 S Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lee William Potts

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles Attorney: Lee William Potts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles Attorney: Lee William Potts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302558; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV20138

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less