This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/24/2022 at 14:23:23 (UTC).

RATCLIFF v. ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 RATCLIFF filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9220

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

John CM Doe

John CB Doe

John RC Doe

Charles Ratcliff, Jr.

Appellants and Defendants

The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles

St. Christopher Catholic Church

St. Mary Catholic Church

St. Lawrence Martyr Catholic Church

Archdiocese of Los Angeles Education & Welfare Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Holly Noelle Boyer

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Anthony M. DeMarco

Attorney at Law Offices of Anthony DeMarco

650 Sierra Madre Villa Avenue, Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91107

Shea Sierra Murphy

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

J. Michael Hennigan

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Elizabeth S. Lachman

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lee W. Potts

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Granted & Transferred to CA 2/5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: Petition for review, one file jacket.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; transferred to CA 2/5; Notes: The petition for review is granted. The matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, Division Five, with directions to vacate its decision and reconsider the cause in light of Bonni v. St. Joseph Health System (2021) 11 Cal.5th 995, 1009-1012. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.528(d).) The Reporter of Decisions is directed not to publish in the Official Appellate Reports the opinion in the above-entitled appeal filed April 29, 2021, which appears at 63 Cal.App.5th 869. (Cal. Const., art. VI, 14; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1125(c)(2).) Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C. J., Liu, Cu llar, Kruger, Groban, and Jenkins, JJ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including September 7, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles Attorney: Lee W. Potts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one file jacket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles Attorney: Lee W. Potts **Originally received timely on June 8, 2021.**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302558; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV20138

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less