This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/11/2021 at 07:45:23 (UTC).

RAPIER v. S.C. (SRCC ASSOCIATES)

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 RAPIER filed an Other lawsuit against C SRCC ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5071

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mary Lynn Rapier

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. William F. Fahey

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Prime Healthcare Services-Encino, LLC

JNL Management, LLC

Prime Health Care Services Foundation

SRCC Associates, LLC

Prime Health Care Services, Inc.

Jonathan Lasko

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer L. Bartlett

Attorney at Barlett Barrow, LLP

225 S. Lake Ave, Ste 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

Brian P. Barrow

Attorney at Bartlett Barrow LLP

225 S. Lake Avenue Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

Charles S. Siegel

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Michael B. Gurien

Attorney at Waters Kraus & Paul, LLP.

222 North Pacific Coast Hwy Suite 1900

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael Leighton Armitage

Attorney at Waters Kraus & Paul

222 N Pacific Coast Hwy, Ste 1900

El Segundo, CA 90245

Gary M. Paul

Attorney at Waters Kraus & Paul LLP

222 North Pacific Coast Hwy. Suite 1900

El Segundo, CA 90245

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Vinay Kohli

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP California

633 W 5Th St Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2073

Paul R. Johnson

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Peter Auguste Strotz

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tian Wei Han

Attorney at King and Spalding, LLC-California

633 W 5Th St Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2073

Angeli Cuesta-Aragon

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 1050

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Clint D. Robison

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 1050

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Theresa M. Marchlewski

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

725 So. Figueroa St. Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Sarah Helene Scheinhorn

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 S Figueroa St Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Dylan Bradley Carp

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Mary Lynn Rapier Attorney: Brian P. Barrow Attorney: Gary M. Paul Attorney: Jennifer L. Bartlett Attorney: Michael Leighton Armitage Arbitration is currently proceeding with a hearing set for 8/30/2021 and presently obligated to produce documents on 10/23/2020, and additional deadlines on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B306925; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC641254

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant