This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 02:23:59 (UTC).

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association v. John Powell et al.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed an Other lawsuit against John Powell. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riemer, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9078

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riemer, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, P.C.

John Powell et al.

Appellants and Defendants

Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, P.C.

John Powell et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Sara Marie McDuffie

Michael G. Colantuono

Pamela Kentos Graham

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Rachel A. Beyda

Robin Meadow

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Colantuono

Pamela Kentos Graham

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Rachel A. Beyda

Robin Meadow

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: ARB/XRB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondent's request for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Any opposition to request for judicial notice is due within 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association Attorney: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh RB/XAOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by respondent/cross appellant Howard Jarvis Taxpayers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.; Notes: (30 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: RB and Appendix; brief was over length per CRC 8.204(c)(1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 07/24/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: John Powell et al.Attorney: Rachel A. Beyda Defendant and Appellant: Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, P.C.Attorney: Michael G. Colantuono; Notes: ARB/XRB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers AssociationAttorney: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh; Notes: RB/XAOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (69 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Jun 28, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Jun 17, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: from appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd May 26, 2022; John Powell Jr. et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1905897; Trial Court Judge: Riemer, Craig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less