This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/10/2023 at 12:04:47 (UTC).

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association et al. v. G. Patrick O'Dowd

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed an Other lawsuit against G Patrick O'Dowd. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sykes, Sunshine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8452

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sykes, Sunshine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Randall C. Roberts

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Appellant and Defendant

G. Patrick O'Dowd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Sara Marie McDuffie

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Pamela Kentos Graham

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: Case in basement storage.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The court's order filed Mar 9, 2022 is vacated. The request for judicial notice is granted. The motion to dismiss is granted because the notice of appeal is untimely. Appellant's motion to stay the appeal is dismissed as moot. HJTA's request for sanctions is denied. HJTA is entitled to its costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The motion to dismiss is granted, because the notice of appeal is untimely. Appellant's motion to stay appeal is dismissed as moot.Vacated per order of Mar 9, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: opposition to motion to dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: to motion to dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: reply to opposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: opposition to request for judicial notice due on/before 15 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellant's motion to stay appeal pending ruling on related writ petition in E078325, opposition, respondent's motion to dismiss filed Feb 17, 2022, CCIS & petition in E078325

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to dismiss appeal by respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to stay appeal pending ruling on related writ petition in E078325.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; missing copy of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to stay appeal pending ruling on related writ petition in E078325.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Feb 1, 2022; G. Patrick O'Dowd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1905977; Trial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1825310; Trial Court Judge: Sykes, Sunshine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less