This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/20/2023 at 21:20:27 (UTC).

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association v. John Powell, Jr. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed an Other lawsuit against John Powell, Jr. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riemer, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9712

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riemer, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellants, Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

John Powell, Jr.

Appellant, Defendant and Cross Defendant

John Powell, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Sara Marie McDuffie

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Pamela Kentos Graham

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Appellant, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Pamela Kentos Graham

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: E079078. The stipulation to consolidate E079078 and E079712 for all purposes is approved. E079078 shall serve as the master file. Pursuant to the stipulation filed in E079078, the first opening brief and appendix are due to be filed on or before Nov 18, 2022. A proposed briefing schedule shall be filed on or before Oct 17, 2022. (in E079078)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: from cross-appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Proposed briefing sequence due 20 days after the 2nd appeal is filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Sep 26, 2022; Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association (cross-appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Sep 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Dtd Sep 13, 2022; By appellant John Powell, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant John Powell et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: To consolidate appeal with E079078; By appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sep 1, 2022; John Powell, Jr., Anthony Bianco, Peter Nelson, James M. Barrett, MWH Global, Inc., Stantec Consulting Services Inc. and Hawksley Consulting, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1905897; Trial Court Judge: Riemer, Craig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less