This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/27/2023 at 00:00:44 (UTC).

Ramis v. Ramis

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 Ramis filed an Other lawsuit against Ramis. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6846

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harold A Ramis

Appellants and Claimants

Erica Mann Ramis

GB Unlimited, LLC

Harold Ramis Enterprises, Inc.

United Talent Agency, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Anne J Ramis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Judith R. Forman

Appellant and Claimant Attorneys

Sean Michael Hardy

Anne Kiley

Robert A. Olson

Alana H. Rotter

Bryan J. Freedman

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Richard C. Leonard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #32608438 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on February 03, 2023 by Erica Mann Ramis, GB Unlimited, LLC, Harold Ramis Enterprises, Inc., and United Talent Agency, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less