This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/19/2022 at 03:26:15 (UTC).

Ramirez et al. v. PK 1 Plaza 580 et al.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Ramirez filed an Other lawsuit against PK 1 Plaza 580. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKinney, Patrick and Grillo, Evelio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4069

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

McKinney, Patrick

Grillo, Evelio

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Francisco Ramirez

Eastvale, CA 92880

Yolanda Ramirez

Eastvale, CA 92880

Defendants and Respondents

PK 1 Plaza 580

Divisions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Samantha Hernandez-Ortega

1875 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

C Michael Alder

1875 Century Park E Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brooke Leone Bove

Attorney at Bove Law Group

3843 S. Bristol St. #234

Santa Ana, CA 92704

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jessica S. Pliner

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ross Eric Lampe

Attorney at Muro & Lampe Inc.

75 Iron Point Circle, Suite 155

Folsom, CA 95630

Corey Daniel McCarthy

Attorney at Muro & Lampe

75 Iron Point Circle, Suite 155

Folsom, CA 95630-8813

Randi Leane Fujimoto

Attorney at Muro & Lampe, Inc.

75 Iron Point Circle Suite 155

Folsom, CA 95630

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Superior court notice rescinding default - made in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Superior Court Clerk certifies: ".. A notification of default was issued to Appellant on 12/16/21, for not being in compliance with CRC8121. Appellant has failed to remedy the default within the time allowed by law. Therefore, no further record shall be forthcoming from this office. &"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant's are no longer in pro per, now represented by Brooke L. Bove SBN 281390

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Contact Information for the Appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: On December 15, 2021, appellants' counsel, Michael Alder and Samantha Hernandez-Ortega of AlderLaw, P.C., filed a motion to withdraw as attorneys of record. The motion, which is unopposed, is granted. Counsel is directed to promptly provide the court and respondents' counsel with appellants' current or last known address and telephone number. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.36(c)(2).) The clerk of this court shall notify the superior court of this court's ruling. (Id., rule 8.36(c)(3).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Opposition to the motion to withdraw was due 12/27/21, as of today nothing has been filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: (12/16/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 196, D & T Legal Services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to Withdraw and Be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs / Appellants, Francisco Ramirez and Yolanda Ramirez; Declaration of Samantha Hernandez-Ortega

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Francisco Ramirez Attorney: C Michael Alder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Francisco RamirezAttorney: C Michael Alder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/30/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiffs Francisco and Yolanda Ramirez appealing judgment from 11/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19002904; Trial Court Judge: Grillo, Evelio

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Divisions Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randi L Fujimoto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ross Lampe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pliner, Jessica Stuart