This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/09/2022 at 01:11:38 (UTC).

Ram Concrete Construction, Inc. v. Everspring Construction, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Ram Concrete Construction, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Everspring Construction, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9766

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Ram Concrete Construction, Inc.

Defendants and Appellants

Everspring Construction, Inc.

Patrick Tsao

Montecito Realty Group L.P.

Suretec Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Robert L. Mezzetti, II

Attorney at Mezzetti Law Firm

31 East Julian Street

San Jose, CA 95112

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Eric F. Hartman

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric F. Hartman

300 S First St. #210

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Default notice filed in Superior Court on 3/28/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance filed on 3/28/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appellants' appeal filed February 1, 2022, is dismissed as taken from a nonappealable order, without prejudice to appellants seeking appropriate writ relief in this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Filed in Superior Court on 3/10/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Filed in Superior Court on 2/14/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Eric Hartman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Everspring Construction, Inc. et al., filed 2/1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everspring Construction Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAM Concrete Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant