This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/28/2021 at 02:50:37 (UTC).

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY et al. v. Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against Workers' Compensation Appeals Board. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5505

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Respondent

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Interested Party

Dexter Nitta

Los Angeles, CA 90008

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kenneth Curt McIntyre

Attorney at Michael Sullivan & Associates

P.O. Box 85059

San Diego, CA 92186-5059

Respondent Attorney

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

P.O. Box 429459

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: Real party in Interest answer to petition for writ of review and request for attorney fees and costs for no reasonable basis for petition for writ of review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: State of California Department of Industrial Relations Worker's Compendation Appeals Board dated October 22, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of review filed (WCAB).; Notes: Petition for writ of review (WCAB).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant