This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/17/2021 at 20:20:06 (UTC).

RALLI v. SHAHINIAN (MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA)

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 RALLI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SHAHINIAN MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2118

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George Ralli

Lynda Ralli

Appellant and Interested Party

Medical Board of California

Defendants and Respondents

Skull Base Institute

Hrayr K. Shahinian

Skull Base Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Oran

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael L. Oran

801 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Richard T. Lobl

Attorney at Law Office of Richard T. Lobl

1024 Bayside Drive, Suite 314

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Appellant and Interested Party Attorney

Rebecca L. Smith

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Phillip A. Baker

Attorney at Baker Keener & Nahra, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 5500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert C. Baker

Attorney at Baker Keener & Nahra LLP

633 West 5Th Street, #5400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2005

Richard Douglas Carroll

Attorney at Carroll Kelly Trotter Franzen McKenna & Peabody

111 West Ocean Boulevard, 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

Thomas V. Girardi

Attorney at Girardi & Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 2 doghouses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Two doghouses (volumes 1 and 2).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: one hard copy of petition for review filed 10/22/18.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Service copy of petition for review filed electronically on 10/22/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Hrayr K. Shahinian Attorney: Phillip A. Baker Attorney: Robert C. Baker Defendant and Respondent: Skull Base Institute Attorney: Phillip A. Baker Attorney: Robert C. Baker Defendant and Respondent: Skull Base Medical Group, Inc. Attorney: Phillip A. Baker Attorney: Robert C. Baker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B284153; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC362005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH REBECCA LYNN