This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/05/2022 at 23:05:51 (UTC).

Rainey et al. v. Nevada Irrigation District

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Rainey filed an Other lawsuit against Nevada Irrigation District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6010

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Anderson, Thomas

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Michael Rainey et al.

Respondent and Defendant

Nevada Irrigation District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Howard Pierce

Attorney at David H. Pierce & Associates PC

15260 Ventura Blvd., Suite 730

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Larry Jen Ho Liu

Attorney at David H. Pierce & Associates PC

15260 Ventura Blvd., Suite 730

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Andrew John McClure

Attorney at Minasian, Meith, Soares, Sexton & Cooper, LLP

P.O. Box 1679 1681 Bird Street

Oroville, CA 95965

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service; Notes: Supplemental proof of service of appellants' opening brief to the trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Michael Rainey et al. Attorney: David Howard Pierce With Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 12/22/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Nevada Irrigation DistrictAttorney: Andrew John McClure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Michael Rainey et al.Attorney: David Howard Pierce; Notes: With Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellants' opening brief now due on November 22, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's Opening Brief Due: 11/04/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 vols. Clerk's Transcript (322 pp.) 1 vol. Reporter's Transcript (16 pp.) Appellant's opening brief due: October 5, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 6/8/2022; designating clerk's and reporter's transcript only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement received on 5/3/22. Rejected at filer's request.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 05/13/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: By appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid. Receipt #R325429.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement and Appellant?s Civil Mediation Statement Due: 05/03/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 03/10/2022. Inverse condemnation, etc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Nevada County Superior Court - Main; County: Nevada; Trial Court Case Number: CU19084309; Trial Court Judge: Anderson, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nevada Irrigation District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry Jen Ho Liu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIERCE DAVID HOWARD