This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/30/2022 at 22:08:32 (UTC).

Ragland v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Ragland filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Leal, Sandy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1493

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Leal, Sandy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sawyer Ragland

Silverado, CA 92676

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Sandra Leal, Dept. C66 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Sunyata, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

David M. Almaraz

Attorney at Alpert, Barr & Grant

15165 Ventura Blvd, Ste 200

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By petitioner (pro per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition summarily denied by order.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of certiorari and request for immediate stay are DENIED. BEDSWORTH, ACTING P. J. * Before Bedsworth, Acting P. J., Moore, J., and Marks, J.** **Judge of the Orange County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.Phoned in order to parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Pursuant to the filing of a Request to Waive Court Fees and Costs, and with good cause appearing therefor, IT IS ORDERED that appellate court fees and costs for the above-entitled action are waived pursuant to rule 8.26. This fee waiver applies only to the appellate fees and costs identified in California Rules of Court, rule 8.26(e) [appellate court filing fee; court fee for telephonic oral argument]. Any request for a waiver of superior court costs and fees must be addressed to the superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's request for fee waiver was rejected, sent twice. Application fee waiver was filed on 06/22/2022 with petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: By petitioner supplemental request for Emergency Stay due to the trial court issuing a new order to add appellant to writ of possession, after this petition was filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: By petitioner for writ of Certiorari. 2 volumes of exhibits in support of petition for writ. (missing pagination consecutively numbered)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: Amended petition by petitioner Sawyer Ragland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for writ of Certiorari. 2 volumes of exhibits in support of petition for writ. (172 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By petitioner Sawyer Ragland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for writ of certiorari by petitioner Sawyer Ragland

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunyata LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant