This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/29/2022 at 04:58:28 (UTC).

Rafalian v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Rafalian filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Escalante, Kristin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2772

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Escalante, Kristin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Behnam Rafalian

Respondents

Hon. Kristin S. Escalante

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Michael Magasinn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jacob N. Segura

Attorney at Jacob N. Segura, A Law Corporation

11400 West Olympic Blvd, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Homan Mobasser

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HOMAN MOBASSER, APC

18375 Ventura Blvd Suite #342

Tarzana, CA 91356

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 W Temple St

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, A Professional Corporation

10203 Santa Monica Blvd. 4Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd. 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on June 1, 2021 has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Real Party in Interest's letter requesting that the court promptly deny petitioner's request for stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 2 of 2.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEICHTER KEVIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEWITT ANDREW E.