This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/17/2023 at 09:01:50 (UTC).

Raddavero v. The Carvery, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Raddavero filed an Other lawsuit against The Carvery, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Swope, V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6688

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Swope, V.

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Mario Raddavero

Amanda Raddavero

Hofbrau Catering

Appellants and Defendants

The Carvery, Inc.

Harry's Hofbrau

J&H Kramer, Inc.

Hazards, Inc.

Harry's of San Leandro, Inc.

Manco, Inc.

Larry Kramer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

William E. Kennedy

Gordon John Finwall

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Robert Walter Thompson

Charles Scott Russell

Michael G. Colantuono

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: Update the court as to the status of the trial court proceedings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #95690

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Parties' joint motion to stay appeal filed on March 8, 2023, is granted until July 31, 2023, or further order of the court, with a joint submission of the parties to be filed within 120 days, updating the court as to the status of the trial court proceedings.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: "PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO STAY APPEAL PENDING FINAL JUDGMENT"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: The Carvery, Inc. Attorney: Charles Scott Russell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Initial by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: The Carvery, Inc.Attorney: Charles Scott Russell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/23/2022 by Counsel for The Carvery, Inc. appealing orders from 10/03/2022 and 10/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: CIV532008; Trial Court Judge: Swope, V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less