Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/04/2021 at 14:56:20 (UTC).

R & R CONSTRUCTION v. ROSKI

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 R R CONSTRUCTION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ROSKI. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4152

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

R & R Construction, Inc.

Defendant and Appellant

Reon Roski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Margaret R. Miglietta

Attorney at Cummins & White LLP

2424 S.E. Bristol Street, Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-0764

Larry M. Arnold

Attorney at Cummins & White LLP

2424 S.E. Bristol Street, Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-07

James John Orland

Attorney at Orland Law Group

1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 100

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Mark Allen Feldman

Attorney at Feldman & Associates, Inc.

11030 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 109

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Marshall Clark Wallace

Attorney at Allen Matkins Lock Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, Twelfth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stacey A. Villagomez

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Marshall C. Wallace

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, Twelfth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: R & R Construction, Inc. Attorney: Margaret R. Miglietta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Reon Roski Attorney: Marshall C. Wallace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: R & R Construction, Inc. Attorney: Margaret R. Miglietta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B293748; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: EC063446

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & R Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall Clark Wallace

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey A. Villagomez