This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/11/2023 at 03:10:19 (UTC).

QUINTANA OFFICE PROPERTY v. S.C. (GODINEZ)

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 QUINTANA OFFICE PROPERTY filed an Other lawsuit against C GODINEZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8114

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Quintana Office Property, LLC.

Hines Interests Limited Partnership

Respondent

Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Nathan T. Vu Dept N15 1275 N Berkeley Ave

Fullerton, CA 92832

Interested Parties

Maribel Godinez

Universal Building Maintenance, LLC

Universal Protection Service, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jeffrey P. Cunningham

Attorney at Schumann Rosenberg & Arevalo LLP

3100 Bristol Sreet, Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Michelle L. Arevalo

Attorney at Schumann Rosenberg & Arevalo, LLP

3100 Bristol St, Ste 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Interested Party Attorneys

Norma V. Garcia

Attorney at Garcia Rainey Blank & Bowerbank LLP

695 Town Center Drive, Suite, 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Gregory K. Lee

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

555 S Flower St Ste 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2407

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including April 13, 2023, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Quintana Office Property, LLC. Attorney: Jeffrey P. Cunningham Petitioner: Hines Interests Limited Partnership Attorney: Jeffrey P. Cunningham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G062117; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01100760

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less