This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/24/2022 at 05:06:10 (UTC).

Prudencio v. Johnson & Johnson et al.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Prudencio filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kaus, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4152

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kaus, Stephen

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Christina G. Prudencio

Appellants and Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph D. Satterley

Attorney at Kazan McClain Satterley & Greenwood

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Ian Wilfred A. Rivamonte

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood

Jack London Market 55 Harrison Street - Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Denyse F. Clancy

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607-3858

Michael T. Stewart

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Upnit K. Bhatti

Attorney at Orrick Herrington& Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Geoffrey Cameron Shaw

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

777 S Figueroa St Ste 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5830

Robert M. Loeb

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington Dc, DC 20005

Alexander G. Calfo

Attorney at King & Spalding

633 West 5Th Street - Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: + 60 days stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Flashdrives of appendix + reporters transcripts.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice granted; Notes: BY THE COURT: The applications of Robert M. Loeb and Uprit K. Bhatti for permission to appear as counsel pro hac vice for appellants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. in the above-referenced appeal are granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: Of Upnit K. Bhatti for appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: Robert M. Loeb for appellants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Of appendix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Notice of filing of appendix on flashdrive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Johnson & Johnson Attorney: Alexander G. Calfo Attorney: Geoffrey Cameron Shaw Attorney: Robert M. Loeb Attorney: Upnit K. Bhatti Defendant and Appellant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. + 60 days stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 01/25/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Christina G. PrudencioAttorney: Denyse F. Clancy Attorney: Ian Wilfred A. Rivamonte Attorney: Joseph D. Satterley Attorney: Michael T. Stewart; Notes: + 60 days stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Johnson & JohnsonAttorney: Alexander G. Calfo Attorney: Geoffrey Cameron Shaw Attorney: Robert M. Loeb Attorney: Upnit K. Bhatti Defendant and Appellant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.; Notes: + 60 days stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-66(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: AOB + 60 days RBF + 60 days ARB + 60 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Letter for CSR extension of time addressed to Alameda Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8.124 + RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1035888

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Johnson & Johnson Attorney: Paul R. Johnson with order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Johnson & JohnsonAttorney: Paul R. Johnson; Notes: with order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/14/2021 by Counsel for Defendants Johnson & Johnson et al. appealing order from 11/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20061303; Trial Court Judge: Kaus, Stephen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant