This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/12/2021 at 06:06:11 (UTC).

Providence Industries, LLC v. Lularoe, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Providence Industries, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Lularoe, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucky IV, L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5513

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucky IV, L.

 

Party Details

Respondents, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Providence Industries, LLC

Providence Industries LLC

Appellants, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Lularoe, LLC (+7)

LLR, Inc

Lularoe, LLC

LLR Inc

Lularoe LLC

LLR, Inc.

Respondents, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Inland Exotic Motors, LLC (+18)

Daniel S. Kang

Lularoe, LLC (+7)

Ghost Squadron, LLC

LLR, Inc

Lularoe, LLC

LLR Inc

Lularoe LLC

LLR, Inc.

Respondents, Defendants and Plaintiffs

Inland Exotic Motors, LLC (+18)

Daniel S. Kang

Providence Industries, LLC

Ghost Squadron, LLC

Providence Industries LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Marsha Ann Houston

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jonathan Daniel Gershon

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher Orlando Rivas

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kasey James Curtis

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant, Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Bradley Alan Chapin

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Kathryn Diane Domin

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Respondent, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Mark Dennis Peterson

Attorney at Cates Peterson, LLP

4100 Newport Place Dr., Suite 230

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Gopi Krishna Panchapakesan

Attorney at Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Fiona Jean Miller

Attorney at Fortis, LLP

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1530

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Bradley Alan Chapin

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Kathryn Diane Domin

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Respondent, Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Dennis Peterson

Attorney at Cates Peterson, LLP

4100 Newport Place Dr., Suite 230

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Gopi Krishna Panchapakesan

Attorney at Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marsha Ann Houston

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jonathan Daniel Gershon

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher Orlando Rivas

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kasey James Curtis

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Fiona Jean Miller

Attorney at Fortis, LLP

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1530

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: w/c form MJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Lularoe, LLC Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: LLR, Inc. Attorney: Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Lularoe, LLC Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: LLR, Inc.Attorney: Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Certificate of interested parties; already included in the resp brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Respondent: Providence Industries, LLC Attorney: Kasey James Curtis

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Sep 2, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Reed Smith LLP requesting we add Kasey J. Curtis as counsel of record for Respondent Providence Industries, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS & Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; no copy of judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Dtd Aug 26, 2020; By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Aug 7, 2020; Lularoe, LLC, Mark Stidham, Deanne Brady, 159DE, LLC, Corona Campus, LLC, Corona Land Campus, LLC, Lennon Leasing, LLC and LLR, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1825263; Trial Court Judge: Lucky IV, L.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LLR, Inc is a litigant