This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/02/2023 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

Prince v. Bertram

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Prince filed an Other lawsuit against Bertram. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is George, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1570

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

George, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

George Morell Prince, III

Respondent and Defendant

William Gerald Bertram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Michael Kowal

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Justin Michael Kincheloe

Victoria Elena Fuller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: ALL documents scanned. No paper copies.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: George Morell Prince, III Appellant failed to file a brief after notice given pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(1). The appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.220(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: George Morell Prince, III; Notes: Appellant failed to file a brief after notice given pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(1). The appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.220(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: **LAST EOT**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: **LAST EOT**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: For 2nd appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant is in default for failure to file a Civil Case Information Statement for their second appeal pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g) in a timely manner. The appeal may be dismissed or monetary sanctions may be imposed unless, within 15 days of the date of this notice, the Civil Case Information Statement is filed with this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLT: George M. Prince III 2nd appeal judgement 5-10-22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Amended CCIS with additional order attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement has been returned. Must fill out, sign and date proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by APLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: George M. Prince III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01015378; Trial Court Judge: George, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less