This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/17/2022 at 00:06:05 (UTC).

Preservation of Benefit Plan Retirees Association et al. v. City of San Jose et al.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Preservation of Benefit Plan Retirees Association filed an Other lawsuit against City of San Jose. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9387

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Preservation of Benefit Plan Retirees Association

Joseph Bass

Lawrence Jay Castellano

Richard Coco

Leslye Corsiglia

Harry Freitas

Linda Horwedel

William Hughes

Danny Jordan

David Maas

Barry Ng

Anita Phagan

George Rios

Gary Schoennauer

Ken Tanase

Wayne Tanda

Nona Tobin

Randal Turner

Steven Turner

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Robert James Bezemek

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert J. Bezemek, P.C.

1322 Webster Street, Suite 401

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

Nora Frimann

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 E. Santa Clara St., 16Th Fl.

San Jose, CA 95113

Raymond Francis Lynch

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew Joseph Peck

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market St Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Preservation of Benefit Plan Retirees Association et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 06/24/2022 By 21 Day(s) 1st

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: -Deposit or Fee Waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed. Appellant owes $960 + $50 Administrative fee for a total of $1,010. Filed 5/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 06/03/2022 By 60 Day(s) 60 days for appellant's opening brief and appendix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Reporter's transcripts filed, AOB due in 40 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Filed 09/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Certificate of Compliance Filed 09/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: -Deposit or Fee Waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed. Filed 09/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed 09/02/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed 09/02/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Preservation of Benefit Plan Retirees Association et al. filed 08/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 17CV312610; Trial Court Judge: Kuhnle, Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Joseph Peck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynch, Raymond Francis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frimann, Nora V.