This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/16/2022 at 00:49:53 (UTC).

Ponciano v. Citrus Community College District

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Ponciano filed an Other lawsuit against Citrus Community College District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6978

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ronald L. Ponciano

Defendants and Respondents

Citrus Community College District

Geraldine Perri

Robert Sammis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Paul M. Mahoney

Attorney at Mahoney & Soll LLP

150 West First Street Suite 180

Claremont, CA 91711

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Dennis John Walsh

Attorney at Walsh & Associates, APC

16633 Ventura Blvd. Suite 800

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to this court's notice sent January 7, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement filed on December 29, 2021 for the appeal filed on November 3, 2021 is deficient as it does not have attached to it a copy of the signed judgment. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) The copy of the appealed judgment attached to the civil case information statement wasn't signed. You must provide the Court with a conformed copy of the signed judgment, with a proof of service attached (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2)), within 15 days of the date of this notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ronald L. Ponciano Attorney: Paul M. Mahoney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ronald L. PoncianoAttorney: Paul M. Mahoney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check #7434 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 3, 2021 by Ronald L. Ponciano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19PSCV00139

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITRUS COMMUNITY COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.