This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/28/2023 at 11:09:39 (UTC).

Ponce v. Lemus

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Ponce filed an Other lawsuit against Lemus. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Spear, Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4235

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Spear, Emily

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Willian Ponce

Appellant and Defendant

Geydi Ortiz Lemus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Richard J. Rosiak

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of Service on appellant Geydi Ortiz Lemus of the court's Apr 14, 2023 order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the motion filed by Aaron Myers of The Appellate Law Firm to withdraw as counsel for appellant Geydi Ortiz Lemus filed Mar 21, 2023. Good cause appearing, the motion to withdraw as counsel is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Aaron Myers of The Appellate Law Firm are relieved as counsel for appellant. Counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on opposing party and appellant, and file proof of service with this court within ten days of the date of this order. This order shall become effective upon counsel's filing with this court a verified proof of service and a copy of this order on appellant Geydi Ortiz Lemus. Appellant is advised that failure to take prompt and appropriate action may result in serious legal consequences and that appellant may want to seek legal assistance.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's counsel's motion to withdraw as attorney of record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order granting relief from 8.140(b) default filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's motion for relief from default of CRC Rule 8.130(b) filed on January 31, 2023. Good cause appearing, the motion is granted. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by his/her failure to perform acts required by the rules of court for procuring the record on appeal. Appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order pay the reporter's transcript fees to the Superior Court or take alternative action as required by California Rules of Court, rule 8.130(b)(3). All acts (except for payment of fees) in compliance with this relief order are to be performed via the Los Angeles County Superior Court's electronic filing service provider. Payment of fees must be made at Room 111-A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California. Appellant shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall appellant take more than 15 days to do so. If appellant fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.per LASC docket, RT fees paid on 2/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion for relief from default filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion for relief from default of CRC Rule 8.130(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: Clerk's notice of non-compliance dated January 05, 2023; failure to pay RT fees/deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 14, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Geydi Ortiz Lemus Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (October 17, 2022 by Geydi Ortiz Lemus. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Geydi Ortiz LemusPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for Geydi Ortiz Lemus.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 17, 2022 by Geydi Ortiz Lemus.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19CMFL00828; Trial Court Judge: Spear, Emily

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less