Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/09/2021 at 03:15:27 (UTC).

POLYCOMP TRUST COMPANY v. AGBEDE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 POLYCOMP TRUST COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AGBEDE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3432

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Entrust Group, Inc.

Polycomp Trust Company

Southwest Bancorp Defined Benefit Plan

Defendants and Appellants

Sonny Agbede

George Karapanian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Daniel L. Krishel

Attorney at Krishel Law Offices

4500 Park Granada, Suite 202

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

William Dolph Beck

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1801 Century Park East, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Rahel Goharchin Javaheri

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1801 Century Park East, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: E070613 - 1 doghouse E071376 - 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (see also E071376 & E072337). One doghouse (see also E071376 & E072337).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Sonny Agbede Attorney: William Dolph Beck Defendant and Appellant: George Karapanian Attorney: William Dolph Beck **E070613 and E071376 were consolidated by the Court of Appeal order filed on 10/18/2018.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E071376 E070613 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS1614139

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLYCOMP TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISHEL DANIEL