Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/03/2021 at 03:26:40 (UTC).

POE v. S.C. (PIONEER MEDICAL GROUP)

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 POE filed an Other lawsuit against C PIONEER MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7595

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Henry Poe

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Olivia Rosales, Department C 12720 Norwalk Boulevard

Norwalk, CA 90650

Interested Parties

Pioneer Medical Group, Inc.

Charles Kung

Patti Morris

Thomas Mahowald

Kathleen Morgan

Sidalia Sousa

Southern California Infectious Disease Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert C. Moest

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2530 Wilshire Boulevard, Second Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Department F 12720 Norwalk Boulevard

Norwalk, CA 90650

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Daniel Vincent Farrugia

Attorney at Law Offices of David J. Weiss

11340 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

David J. Weiss

Attorney at David Weiss Law

11340 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Richard Douglas Carroll

Attorney at Carroll Kelly Trotter Franzen McKenna & Peabody

111 West Ocean Boulevard, 14Th Floor P.O. Box 22636

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including June 9, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed; Notes: By Henry Poe, Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended Proof of Service. Henry Poe, Petitioner Robert C. Moest, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Henry Poe Attorney: Robert C. Moest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B310446; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC721826

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INFECTIOUS DISEASE ME is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where PIONEER MIDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOEST ROBERT CHARLES